judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KAY VS. JIMMERSON & HANSEN, P.C.

Case Information: 34607
Short Caption:KAY VS. JIMMERSON & HANSEN, P.C.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A387117Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/28/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/02/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
08/02/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07080
08/03/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Edith Marguerite Kay-Money Order #02-696823306.
09/07/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 99-08325
09/28/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Mailed on 09/23/99. 99-09268
09/28/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/26/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "We ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant. We direct the clerk of the court to return respondent's supplement to the record on appeal, because it is ouside the record and respondent did not make a motion to supplement the record.] - SNP99B-WM/MS/NB. 00-06804
04/26/2000Other Other. RETURNED, UNFILED, "Supplement to Record on Appeal" (submitted by attorney James J. Jimmerson). 99-10216
05/23/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal. 00-08504
05/23/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/26/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 25, 2000. 00-08504