judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LEROYLYNE COLE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 79-CF-1231
Short Caption:LEROYLYNE COLE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:12/03/1979

Opening Event Date:12/03/1979Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/28/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/19/1984
Argued/Submitted:04/10/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLeroylyne Cole N
Karen Knopp O'Konski YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Thomas E. Zeno YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901COLE, LEROYLYNE UNITED STATES
12/03/1979FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/28/1983FiledRecord Completed
01/19/1984FiledBriefing Completed
04/10/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/24/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition