Case: 01-07-00148-CR
01-07-00148-CR
02/28/2007
Miscellaneous/Other Criminal including Misdemeanor or Felony
Jose Angel Moreno
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/08/2007 | Waiver by the State to file brief | State | |
08/01/2007 | Anders brief filed | Anders | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/10/2008 | Mandate issued | | |||
11/16/2007 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||
11/01/2007 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirm TC judgment |
| ||
11/01/2007 | Motion to withdraw attorney disposed | Grant motion | | ||
10/12/2007 | Submitted | | |||
09/17/2007 | Pro Se response to Anders brief | | |||
09/11/2007 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||
08/30/2007 | Order entered | Issue sua sponte order | | ||
08/30/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion | | ||
08/08/2007 | Waiver by the State to file brief | | |||
08/06/2007 | Order entered | Motion will be taken with case | | ||
08/06/2007 | Motion to withdraw attorney disposed | Motion will be taken with case | | ||
08/01/2007 | Appellants brief due | | |||
08/01/2007 | Motion to withdraw attorney filed | | |||
08/01/2007 | Anders brief filed | | |||
07/02/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
07/02/2007 | Appellants brief due | | |||
06/25/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion | | ||
06/11/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
06/11/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion | | ||
06/11/2007 | Appellants brief due | | |||
05/21/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
05/20/2007 | Appellants brief due | | |||
04/23/2007 | Record due | | |||
04/20/2007 | Reporters record filed | | |||
04/05/2007 | Clerks record filed | | |||
02/28/2007 | Notice of appeal received | | |||
02/28/2007 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||
02/23/2007 | Clerks notice of appeal filed | | |||
02/22/2007 | Dates sentence imposed in in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/10/2008 | Retention | Criminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value) |
05/09/2008 | Retention | Strip file 60 days after issuance of mandate |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Moreno, Jose Angel | Criminal - Appellant | Jose Angel Moreno Clyde Hill Williams |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | William J. Delmore III |
Trial Court Information
228th District Court
Harris
Honorable Marc C. Carter
1075704
25 years TDC