judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HIGH RISE VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 38119
Short Caption:HIGH RISE VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 44249
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A424423Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Leavitt, Maupin, YoungCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/17/2002 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:01/17/2002How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/05/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Young. Law firm of Lionel Sawyer & Collins.
07/05/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Lionel Sawyer & Collins--check no. 119342.
07/05/2001Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 01-11273
07/05/2001AppendixFiled Appendix. 01-11274
07/05/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. Law firm of Hale Lane Peek Dennison Howard & Anderson.
07/05/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Law firm of Hale Lane Peek Dennison Howard & Anderson.
07/25/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real parties in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. 01-12620
08/22/2001Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Real parties in interest JWSRHS and John Surgent. 01-14219
08/24/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Joinder. in JWSRHS, LLC and John Surgent's Answer and Opposition to Petition for Extraordinary Relief. 01-14392
08/29/2001MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Permission to File Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 01-14619
09/10/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion for Permission to File Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 01-15211
10/09/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Granting Motion to File Reply and Denying Motion to Strike. We grant the petitioners motion, and direct the clerk of this court to file the reply provisionally submitted with the motion. In the reply, petitioners move to strike a footnote in the answer. We deny the motion to strike; however, we remind all counsel that they are expected to maintain at least minimal standards of decorum and professionalism in proceedings before this court, and to refrain from engaging in excessive rhetoric and personal attacks on parties or each other. 01-16924
10/09/2001MotionFiled Reply to Response. Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 01-14622
12/06/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on January 17, 2002, at 10:00 a.m. in Carson City. (NNP02-MS/RR/NB)
01/03/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
01/17/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP02-MS/RR/NB
05/09/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition. Granting Petition for Writ of Mandamus. "ORDER the petition GRANTED and direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of mandamus instructing the district court to vacate its order disqualifying LSC from representing high rise in the underlying litigation." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-08133
05/09/2002WritIssued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to Dennis L. Kennedy for service upon Judge Valorie J. Vega. 02-08184
05/17/2002WritFiled Writ. Served on Judge Vega on May 13, 2002. 02-08184
06/04/2002RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 02-08269
06/04/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.