Case: 12-08-00190-CR
12-08-00190-CR
05/05/2008
Aggravated Sexual Assault
Michael David Whitton
The State of Texas
No
14th Court of Appeals
07/03/2008
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/03/2008 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | 14th Court of Appeals | |
07/01/2008 | Reporters record filed | | |
06/30/2008 | Notice of late record | Warning from the Court | |
06/10/2008 | Notice of late record | | |
06/02/2008 | Supplemental clerks record filed | | |
05/28/2008 | Trial court certification filed | | |
05/23/2008 | Order entered | | |
05/23/2008 | Internal memo | | |
05/23/2008 | Clerks record filed | | |
05/14/2008 | Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk | | |
05/14/2008 | Docketing statement filed | | |
05/08/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/05/2008 | Court packet sent to parties | | |
05/05/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal filed | | |
05/05/2008 | Case began in court of appeals | | |
04/30/2008 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |
04/29/2008 | Trial court certification filed | | |
03/28/2008 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/03/2008 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Ms. Lynda K. Russell |
Whitton, Michael David | Criminal - Appellant | Ms. Cornelia A. Hartman |
Trial Court Information
123rd District Court
Shelby
Honorable Guy W. Griffin
05CR-16,357
Life/TDCJ-ID