Case: 08-08-00090-CR
08-08-00090-CR
03/14/2008
Aggravated Assault
Justin Dale Eubank
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/01/2008 | Anders brief filed | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/08/2010 | Mandate issued | | |||||
08/19/2009 | Motion to withdraw attorney disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
08/19/2009 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
03/31/2009 | Submitted | | |||||
02/04/2009 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||||
11/16/2008 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
11/06/2008 | Notice of late brief | | |||||
10/22/2008 | Motion pending | Motion to pass and consider with case | | ||||
10/10/2008 | Motion to withdraw attorney filed | | |||||
10/01/2008 | Letter issued by the court | | |||||
10/01/2008 | Anders brief filed | | |||||
09/03/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
09/02/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
07/17/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
07/17/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
06/16/2008 | Reporters record filed | | |||||
06/16/2008 | Clerks record filed | | |||||
06/11/2008 | Reporters record received not filed | | |||||
03/27/2008 | Trial court certification filed | | |||||
03/24/2008 | Letter filed | | |||||
03/14/2008 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||||
03/14/2008 | Notice to trial court that certification is missing | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/08/2010 | Retention | Criminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Eubank, Justin Dale | Criminal - Appellant | Hon. Tracey Bright Scown Hon. Robert Leahey |
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. John L. Pool |
Trial Court Information
109th District Court
Andrews
Honorable James L. Rex
5068
25 yrs IDTDCJ