judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-437
A-437
01/05/1945
Application for Writ of Error
LEONARD DEDEAR, ET AL.
M. F. JAMES
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/11/1945Amended PetitionPetitioner
02/08/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/18/1945Reply to ResponsePetitioner
01/09/1945Response to PetitionRespondent
01/05/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/11/1945Amended Petition
04/11/1945Addendum to brief filed
02/08/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/08/1945Miscellaneous MotionFiling granted
01/18/1945Reply to Response
01/09/1945Response to Petition
01/05/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
01/05/1945Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
M. F. JamesRespondent
Leonard Dedear, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information