judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SELLS, JR. (WILLIAM) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38115
Short Caption:SELLS, JR. (WILLIAM) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 31265 , 33994 , 34062 , 35758 , 44513 , 47013 , 54064 , 58062 , 68960 , 68960-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C106554Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/15/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/02/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/02/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-11166
07/24/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 38114/38115/38129-cases are not consolidated. 01-12545
11/15/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 6. 01-19055
11/15/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/05/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-15338
10/01/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-15401
10/01/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/14/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 3, 2002. 02-15401