Case: 08-0195
08-0195
03/13/2008
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
GLENN FLOYD SMITH
COUNTY OF GALVESTON, TEXAS ABL MANAGEMENT, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/14/2008 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | Appendix attached to pet/rev. | |
05/14/2008 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | On behalf of Glenn Floyd Smith. | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/27/2008 | Case Stored | G02 Row 2 E-4 | | |
08/21/2008 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | Final Order sent to the Court of Appeals | | |
07/11/2008 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | | |
06/03/2008 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
06/02/2008 | Response Waiver filed | Response waiver filed on behalf of County of Galveston, Texas. (3) | | |
06/02/2008 | Response Waiver filed | Filed on behalf of respondents, on behalf of ABL Management, Inc. (Orig & 1) | | |
05/14/2008 | Appendix Filed | Appendix attached to pet/rev. | | |
05/14/2008 | Petition for Review | On behalf of Glenn Floyd Smith. | | |
04/11/2008 | Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks. | Denied | Motion for an order to extend regular schedule sessions in prison law library DENIED | |
04/07/2008 | Letter Filed | Petitioner checking the status of his motion. On behalf of Glenn Smith. (1) | | |
03/27/2008 | Document received (See Remarks) | Motion for suspension of rules treated as "Document rec'd" filed on behalf of Glenn Smith. (1) | | |
03/27/2008 | Miscellaneous Motion | Motion for an order to extend regular schedule sessions in prison law library. On behalf of Glenn F. Smith. (3) | | |
03/13/2008 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | M/e/t to file pet/rev is granted. Pet/rev is due May 14, 2008. | |
03/13/2008 | Affidavit of Inability to Pay Court Costs | Affidavit of inability to pay incorporated w/ 53.7 (5) filed on behalf of Glenn F. Smith. | | |
03/13/2008 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Spoke w/ Mr. Glywasky. RSP is not opposed to the 53.7. | | |
03/13/2008 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | 53.7 (5) filed on behalf of Glenn F. Smith. | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
08/27/2008 | Case Stored | Case stored. | G02 Row 2 E-4 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
ABL Management, Inc. | Respondent | Mr. William Terry Fitzgerald Mr. Scott Garyt Hunziker |
Smith, Glenn F. | Petitioner | Mr. Clement Aldridge Junior Mr. Glenn F. Smith |
County of Galveston, Texas | Respondent | Mr. Donald S. Glywasky |
Court of Appeals Information:
01-07-00634-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 1]
___ SW3d ___, 01-31-08
1st Court of Appeals
Honorable Terry Jennings
Trial Court Information
122nd District Court
Galveston
Honorable John A. Ellisor
05-CV-1610