judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

J. A. GLASSCOCK, ET AL. v. PERMIAN OIL COMPANY, ET AL., STANOLIND OIL AND GAS COMPANY, JOHN H. TYLER AND EULA B. TYLER

Case: A-442
A-442
01/08/1945
Application for Writ of Error
J. A. GLASSCOCK, ET AL.
PERMIAN OIL COMPANY, ET AL., STANOLIND OIL AND GAS COMPANY, JOHN H. TYLER AND EULA B. TYLER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/03/1945Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/27/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/17/1945Response to PetitionRespondent
01/12/1945Response to PetitionRespondent
01/11/1945Response to PetitionRespondent
01/08/1945Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
01/08/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/03/1945Reply to Response
03/01/1945Response to Motion filed
02/27/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/17/1945Response to Petition
01/12/1945Response to Petition
01/11/1945Response to Petition
01/08/1945Amicus Curiae Brief received
01/08/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
01/08/1945Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Permian Oil Company, et al.Respondent
W. H. LipscombAmicus Curiae
J. A. Glasscock, et al.Petitioner
John H. Tyler and Eula B. TylerRespondent
Stanolind Oil and Gas CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information