judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CENTURY GENERAL CONTRACTORS, INC. V. SHAWN M. SIMS

Case Information: 10-AA-0900
Short Caption:CENTURY GENERAL CONTRACTORS, INC. V. SHAWN M. SIMSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES01140-10Filed Date:07/22/2010

Opening Event Date:07/22/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/20/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerCentury General Contractors IncorporatedNPro SeN
RespondentShawn M. Sims NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/22/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
07/22/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
07/23/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Michael A. Milwee, Esq.
08/05/2010 On consideration of the petition for review in this matter, and it appearing that Century General Contractors is a business that must be represented by counsel, it is ORDERED that petitioner shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (A)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. (JAC)
08/27/2010ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
08/27/2010DISMISSED
09/20/2010MANDATE ISSUED
09/28/2010RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO REMAND (DOES filed motion - case has already been dismissed)
10/13/2010 On consideration of the DC Dep't of Employment Services motion to remand, and it appearing that this court dismissed this matter August 27, 2010, it is ORDERED that the motion is denied as moot. (ETW)
04/17/2014FiledArchived