judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MILLER (RUSSELL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38114
Short Caption:MILLER (RUSSELL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C134668Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/19/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/02/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/02/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-11163
07/24/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 38114/38115/38129-cases are not consolidated. 01-12543
11/19/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 01-19367
11/19/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/25/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-07360
05/21/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-07380
05/21/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/17/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 24, 2002. 02-07380