judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KENNETH REECE HOWERY, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-172)
Case Number:06-172Case Docketed On:07/24/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Big Horn CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:KENNETH REECE HOWERY, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:KENNETH REECE HOWERY, JR., Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKenneth Reece Howery Jr.Kenneth M. Koski
Donna D. Domonkos
Tina N. Olson
Sylvia Lee Hackl
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/24/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/24/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/24/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/25/2006Event - Phone Call from district court clerk re docketing letter; her name is on address and salutation line instead of public defender. Called counsel, reprinted letterEventPhone CallFinal
09/08/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/11/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/19/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/20/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/14/2006Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with wavierMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
11/15/2006Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
11/15/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal