Case: 14-10-00938-CV
14-10-00938-CV
09/28/2010
Unknown Civil Case Type.
Dorothea Cangelosi
Lena Jo Barber
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/01/2018 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |||||
04/08/2011 | Case stored | | |||||
04/08/2011 | Mandate issued | | |||||
04/07/2011 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||||
03/14/2011 | Petition for review was not filed | | |||||
03/14/2011 | Petition for review due in Supreme Court | | |||||
02/11/2011 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |||||
02/11/2011 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||
01/27/2011 | Memorandum opinion issued | DISMISSED |
| ||||
01/26/2011 | Submitted | | |||||
01/26/2011 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
01/06/2011 | Response due | | |||||
12/27/2010 | Response due | | |||||
12/27/2010 | Clerks record due | | |||||
12/22/2010 | No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record | | |||||
12/21/2010 | Letter filed | | |||||
12/09/2010 | No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record | | |||||
12/09/2010 | No clerks record filed in civil case | | |||||
12/07/2010 | Letter filed | | |||||
12/07/2010 | Record due | | |||||
11/23/2010 | Letter filed | | |||||
11/01/2010 | Response due | | |||||
10/20/2010 | Past due court fee notice | | |||||
10/19/2010 | Mediation docketing statement due | | |||||
10/19/2010 | Docketing statement due | | |||||
10/04/2010 | Letter issued by the court | | |||||
10/04/2010 | Letter issued by the court | | |||||
10/04/2010 | Court reporters information sheet sent | | |||||
10/04/2010 | Court fee due | | |||||
09/28/2010 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||
09/22/2010 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
08/09/2010 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | | |||||
06/15/2010 | Request for findings of fact and conclusions of law | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/01/2018 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Cangelosi, Dorothea | Appellant | John Edward Maher |
Barber, Lena Jo | Appellee | Jack R. Crews |
Trial Court Information
400th District Court
Fort Bend
Honorable Clifford J. Vacek
05-DCV-144145