judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RODNEY N. DEMPSEY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-1057
Short Caption:RODNEY N. DEMPSEY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7588-86Filed Date:09/03/1987

Opening Event Date:09/03/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/07/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/08/1988
Argued/Submitted:02/01/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/09/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRodney N. Dempsey N
Bernard Jay Williams YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Ronald C. Crump YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DEMPSEY, RODNEY N. UNITED STATES
09/03/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BERNARD JAY WILLIAMS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/14/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS OUT OF TIME JB PANEL SCDATE 101387 SCHPRD DSA
10/14/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/19/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 110287 SCHPRD R
10/29/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JJ PANEL SCDATE 102687 SCHPRD OPE
04/07/1988FiledRecord Completed
04/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (223 PGS - DAVIS) JB PANEL SCDATE 110287 SCHPRD RT
04/08/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/12/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 051888 SCHPRD BA
06/08/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7/19/88 (NO OPA) MLH PB PANEL SCDATE 061688 SCHPRD BE
07/12/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 9TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 071988 SCHPRD BE
07/19/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 8/9/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 071488 SCHPRD V
08/08/1988FiledBriefing Completed
08/08/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 080988 SCHPRD BE
02/01/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/01/1989SUBMITTED PANELRGMKKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/16/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGMKKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/16/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/09/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD