judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LAWRENCE R. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-1058
Short Caption:LAWRENCE R. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6016-86Filed Date:09/01/1987

Opening Event Date:09/01/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/25/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/29/1988
Argued/Submitted:11/10/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/19/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLawrence R. Williams N
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Patricia A. Riley YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILLIAMS, LAWRENCE R. UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/11/10 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - GREENLEER FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - RILEYPA FOR - APPELLEE
09/01/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/16/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1987STATEMENT BY APPELLANT OF TRANSCRIPT ORDERED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/28/1987ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/16/1987RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 110287 SCHPRD R
01/25/1988FiledRecord Completed
01/25/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (290 PGS - TOOBY) JB PANEL SCDATE 123187 SCHPRD RT
03/07/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 030788 SCHPRD BA
04/13/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF GT (PB) PANEL SCDATE 041188 SCHPRD BE
04/13/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE BRIEF & APPENDIX GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/29/1988FiledBriefing Completed
04/29/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/09/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/14/1988LETTER GRANT REQ OF APLT FOR ORAL ARG ON SUM CAL OF 11/10/88. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 091988 SCHPRD OPE
11/10/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/10/1988ARGUED PANELRGMKTE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/29/1988AFFIRMED JDGMT AF JDGMT OF CONVICTION PANELRGMKTE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/29/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -TE CITE 552 A.2d 510
12/29/1988OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - TE PAGE # - 2687 -A
01/19/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD