judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ARTHUR THOMAS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-1108
Short Caption:ARTHUR THOMAS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8573-87Filed Date:09/25/1987

Opening Event Date:09/25/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/24/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/14/1988
Argued/Submitted:05/18/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/13/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantArthur Thomas N
Geoffrey D. AllenYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Saul M. PilchenYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901THOMAS, ARTHUR UNITED STATES
09/25/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/06/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) GEOFFREY D. ALLEN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/28/1987RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 112487 SCHPRD R
10/30/1987ORDER APLT DOCKETING STATE DUE W/IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 101687 SCHPRD DSA
11/02/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 110987 SCHPRD DSA
05/11/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (624 PGS - SIMMS) JB PANEL SCDATE 113087 SCHPRD RT
06/24/1988FiledRecord Completed
06/24/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (176 PGS - MITCHELL) JB PANEL SCDATE 120187 SCHPRD RT
06/27/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/05/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/9/88 GT PB PANEL SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD BA
09/09/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 090988 SCHPRD BA
10/21/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 21, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 101188 SCHPRD BE
11/16/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 14, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 112188 SCHPRD BE
12/06/1988ORDER GRT APLE'S MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 12/14/88. PB PANELRO SCDATE 111788 SCHPRD V
12/14/1988FiledBriefing Completed
12/14/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 121488 SCHPRD BE
05/18/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/18/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELMKNWTE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/18/1989SUBMITTED PANELMKNWTE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/18/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
06/13/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD