judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTHONY T. HALL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-1111
Short Caption:ANTHONY T. HALL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6658-81Filed Date:09/29/1987

Opening Event Date:09/29/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/11/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/02/1988
Argued/Submitted:12/05/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/04/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnthony T. Hall N
Thomas M. Slawson YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Julieanne Himelstein YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HALL, ANTHONY T. AKA ANTHONY THOMPSON UNITED STATES
01/01/1904JUDGE - TE AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
09/29/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/06/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS M. SLAWSON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/15/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 101687 SCHPRD DSA
11/03/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/03/1987RECORD ON APPEAL MLH PANEL SCDATE 113087 SCHPRD R
12/11/1987FiledRecord Completed
12/11/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (8 PGS - SALAZAR) JB PANEL SCDATE 113087 SCHPRD RT
12/23/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL COMP OF RT. EBP PANEL SCDATE 121487 SCHPRD BA
01/20/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER RT HAS BEEN FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 010588 SCHPRD EBP
04/04/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/28/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/2/88 MLH (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 051088 SCHPRD BE
06/02/1988FiledBriefing Completed
06/02/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 060288 SCHPRD BE
11/04/1988RECEIVED LETTER DATED 10/30/88 FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/07/1988LETTER LTR TO COUNSEL FOR APLT RE: APLT'S 11/4/88 LTR. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/05/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/05/1988SUBMITTED PANELSTSCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELSTSCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/04/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD