judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RONE J. HENSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-1059
Short Caption:RONE J. HENSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12295-86Filed Date:09/04/1987

Opening Event Date:09/04/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/28/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/15/1989
Argued/Submitted:07/18/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/10/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRone J. Henson N
James W. KleinNY
Blaise S. Supler YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Thomas C. Black YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HENSON, RONE J. UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/07/18 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - SUPLERB FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - BLACKTH FOR - APPELLEE
09/04/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/15/1987STATEMENT BY APPELLANT OF TRANSCRIPT ORDERED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/16/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/28/1987ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/22/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (5 PGS - JOYNER) PB PANEL SCDATE 110387 SCHPRD R
06/28/1988FiledRecord Completed
06/28/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (25 PGS - SIMMS) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/28/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (827 PGS - SIMMS) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2-16-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 011889 SCHPRD BE
01/30/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO 2/16/89. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 010288 SCHPRD RT
02/14/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3-15-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 021689 SCHPRD BE
02/24/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 3/15/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 021689 SCHPRD X
03/15/1989FiledBriefing Completed
03/15/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 031589 SCHPRD BE
05/02/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/09/1989LETTER GRANTING REQ OF APLT FOR ARG ON SUM CAL OF 7/18/89. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 051589 SCHPRD OPE
07/06/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/06/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/13/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL REPLY BRF & REPLY BRF IS FL. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 071789 SCHPRD CHECK
07/13/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/18/1989ARGUED PANELNWSTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/19/1989AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM...CAUSE RM FOR VACATION OF ADW CONVICTION. PANELNWSTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/19/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -ST CITE 563 A.2d 1096
09/19/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - ST PAGE # - 2031
10/10/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/27/1989NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIFILED IN US SUPREME COURT ON 11/17/89 #89-6056 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD Denied