judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LEATHA J. WOOD V. REV. TIMOTHY S. HEALY

Case Information: 90-CV-0512
Short Caption:LEATHA J. WOOD V. REV. TIMOTHY S. HEALYClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA5669-87Filed Date:03/28/1990

Opening Event Date:03/28/1990Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/16/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/13/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLeatha J. Wood N
Arthur D. Mckey NN
AppelleeTimothy S. Healy N
J. Alan Galbraith NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WOOD, LEATHA J. ET AL HEALY, REV. TIMOTHY S. ET AL
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 05/30/90 ORD:APLT'S MO GRANTED NOTE - 01 ONLY TO THE EXTENT APLT TENDER NOTE - 02 $50 FEE & FL THE DSA, DR, SRT NOTE - 02 W/IN 10 DAYS; NFX.
03/28/1990FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/10/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE DS TO FILE A JOINT DSA, SRT, AND DR FOR 30 DAYS AD PANEL SCDATE 043090 SCHPRD DR
05/30/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 THUR 02 GW PANELRBH SCDATE 050990 SCHPRD V
06/11/1990DESIGNATION OF RECORD AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/11/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 061190 SCHPRD DSA
06/11/1990$50.00 DOCKETING FEE PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/11/1990STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/26/1990COPY OF SUPERIOR COURT LETTER AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1990FiledRecord Completed
08/16/1990RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 081190 SCHPRD R
08/21/1990STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/29/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(46 PGS/ SWAGERTY) AD PANEL SCDATE 111390 SCHPRD RT
11/01/1990STIPULATION TO DISMISS APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/20/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
11/20/1990ORDER APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED. JJ PANELJWR SCDATE 110790 SCHPRD B
11/20/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE STIPULATION BY PARTIES
12/13/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD