judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

INDUSTRIAL ACCIDENT BOARD, ET AL. v. O. E. GLENN, ET AL.

Case: A-439
A-439
01/08/1945
Application for Writ of Error
INDUSTRIAL ACCIDENT BOARD, ET AL.
O. E. GLENN, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/29/1945Motion for RehearingRespondent
10/27/1945Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/02/1945Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
08/28/1945Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
08/02/1945Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/28/1945Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
05/12/1945Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/04/1945Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/04/1945Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/04/1945Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/03/1945Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/03/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/19/1945Brief on the MeritsRespondent
03/15/1945Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
03/14/1945Brief on the MeritsRespondent
03/01/1945Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/17/1945Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
01/31/1945Exhibits in case/cause filed
01/31/1945Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
01/22/1945Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
01/22/1945Response to PetitionRespondent
01/08/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/29/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/27/1945Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/02/1945Amicus Curiae Brief received
08/28/1945Amicus Curiae Brief received
08/09/1945Additional Copies received
08/02/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/18/1945Opinion issued
05/28/1945Brief in Support of Petition
05/14/1945Response to Motion filed
05/12/1945Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/08/1945Additional Copies received
05/05/1945Additional Copies received
05/04/1945Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/04/1945Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/04/1945Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/03/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/03/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/18/1945Opinion issued
03/19/1945Brief on the Merits
03/15/1945Brief on the Merits
03/14/1945Brief on the Merits
03/01/1945Reply to Response
02/24/1945Motion for Extension of Time to File Response
02/17/1945Supplemental Brief filed
01/31/1945Exhibits in case/cause filed
01/31/1945Amicus Curiae Brief received
01/31/1945Document received (See Remarks)
01/22/1945Amicus Curiae Brief received
01/22/1945Response to Petition
01/08/1945Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/08/1945Additional Copies received
01/08/1945Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Black, Graves and StaytonAmicus Curiae
Frank S. RobertsAmicus Curiae
Industrial Accident Board, et al.Petitioner
Angus G. WynneAmicus Curiae
White and YarboroughAmicus Curiae
John T. GanoAmicus Curiae
Fulbright, Crooker, Freeman and BatesAmicus Curiae
Sewall MyerAmicus Curiae
O. E. Glenn, et al.Respondent
Compensation Insurance Carriers and Pacific Indemnity CompanyAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information