judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SMITH (WAYNE) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 38111
Short Caption:SMITH (WAYNE) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - 24702A
Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - 24703A
Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/02/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/02/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 01-11158
07/23/2001Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on July 18, 2001, appointing Robert Witek as counsel for appellant. 01-12497
08/06/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Mr. Lawton may not withdraw from representation without the permission of this court, and not until Mr. Lawton has fulfilled the obligations placed on trial counsel by NRAP 3C(b). Mr. Lawton must first file a fast track statement. Mr. Lawton shall file a fast track statement within 40 days of this order. Thereafrter, this appeal shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 3C. fn1[Mr. Witek shall continue as appellate counsel, and may file a supplemental fast track statement if necessary, as provided by NRAP 3C(g).] 01-13226
09/20/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion to File Fast Track Statement, Appendix and No Transcript Request Beyond Time. 01-15903
09/25/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed September 20, 2001. The clerk shall file the fast track statement, appendix, and certificate of no transcript requested received on September 20, 2001. Respondent shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track response. 01-16143
09/25/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-15905
09/25/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-15906
09/25/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 01-15904
10/12/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: October 22, 2001. 01-17211
10/23/2001Other Returned Unfiled Document. (appendix attached)
10/29/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-18099
10/29/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 01-18100
12/05/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that Smith's contention lacks merit, and we "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-20343
01/02/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-20534
01/02/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 3, 2002. 01-20534