judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TORREON HARRIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0903
Short Caption:TORREON HARRIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-21114-09Filed Date:07/15/2010

Opening Event Date:07/15/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/17/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/08/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/04/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/02/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTorreon Harris YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Kathleen A. Connolly YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/15/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/04/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Cynthia Nordone, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
08/04/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Cynthia Nordone, Esquire
09/08/2010MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT no oppo
09/08/2010RECEIVED - aplt's statement re transcript.
09/14/2010 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. (Castillo)
09/14/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
10/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (9 pgs/Ransom-Jones) 3/31/10 proc. (incomplete)
10/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (95 pgs/Johnson) 4/1/10 proc.
10/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (252 pgs/Swaringer) 4/5-6/10 proc. cd attached
10/07/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
10/12/2010RECORD INDEX
10/12/2010RECORD COPIES
11/09/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF pending completion of transcripts. NO OPPO
11/17/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/17/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, wherein appellant indicate(s) that transcript is being prepared, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the brief of appellant shall be filed within 40 days from the date the transcript is filed with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall advise this court within 15 days thereof of appellant's receipt of the ordered transcript. (JAC)
11/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (29 pgs/tape) 3/31/10 proc. w/cd
11/18/2010 On consideration of this court's order of November 17, 2010, wherein appellant was directed to file the brief within 40 days from the date the trancsript is filed with this court, and it appearing that the transcript has been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall file the brief and limited appendix within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/28/2010RECEIVED - Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief (Certificate of Service incomplete attorney notified by phone)
12/28/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 30 days (unopposed)
01/06/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before January 27, 2011. (JAC)
01/28/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 30 days. no oppo
02/03/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before February 28, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC)
03/02/2011 error
03/02/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (unopposed)
03/02/2011RECEIVED - Appellant's Brief with Appendix attached
03/10/2011 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for leave to file the lodged brief and limited appendix, it is ORDERED that the appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (JAC)
03/10/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
03/10/2011APPENDIX
04/08/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
04/08/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/28/2011FiledFinal Screening - Regular
06/21/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
07/21/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
08/09/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Nordone) (Appellant)
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/23/2011FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellee)
10/04/2011FiledArgued Before Fisher,Blackburne-Rigsby,Schwelb Cynthia Nordone Esq.,for appellant. Kathleen A.Connolly Esq.,for appellee
10/07/2011FiledRemanded (MOJ) (Fisher and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges, and Schwelb, Senior Judge.)
10/21/2011FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
11/02/2011FiledMandate