Case: D-1933
D-1933
01/03/1992
App Writ of Error
GEORGE DOUGLAS LOTT
MARGO Z. BEST
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/08/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/07/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/06/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
03/10/1992 | Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed | Respondent | | |
03/03/1992 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
01/28/1992 | Reply to Response | Respondent | brief of Attorney Ad Litem for Neal David Lott, A Child | |
01/27/1992 | Supplemental Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
01/20/1992 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
01/03/1992 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/08/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/07/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/06/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
03/12/1992 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | Rehearing overruled | | |
03/11/1992 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Overruled | | |
03/10/1992 | Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed | | | |
03/03/1992 | Conditional motion for rehearing | No description available. | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date. | |
03/03/1992 | Motion for Rehearing | | | |
03/03/1992 | Motion for Rehearing forwarded | RECORD IN CLERKS OFFICE | | |
02/26/1992 | Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks. | Overruled | Resp's mo for damages | |
02/26/1992 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | W/Resp's mo for damages overruled | |
01/28/1992 | Reply to Response | brief of Attorney Ad Litem for Neal David Lott, A Child | | |
01/27/1992 | Supplemental Brief filed | | | |
01/23/1992 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
01/20/1992 | Miscellaneous Motion | Motion for Damages | | |
01/20/1992 | Reply to Response | | | |
01/03/1992 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
03/12/1992 | Case Stored | Case stored. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
BEST, MARGO Z. | Respondent | Ms. Diana S. Friedman Mr. Brian L. Webb |
N.D.L. (MINOR) | Other interested party | Mr. Vaughn L. Bailey |
ATTORNEY AT LITEM | Other interested party | Mr. Vaughn L. Bailey |
GEORGE DOUGLAS LOTT | Petitioner | Mr. George D. Lott |
Court of Appeals Information:
02-90-00112-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
RULE 90, 10-23-91
2nd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
231st District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Maryellen W. Hicks
231-116678-87