judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LANDON G. DOWDEY V. D.C. REDEVELOPMENT LAND AGENCY

Case Information: 90-CV-0514
Short Caption:LANDON G. DOWDEY V. D.C. REDEVELOPMENT LAND AGENCYClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA2458-87Filed Date:03/30/1990

Opening Event Date:03/30/1990Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/17/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/24/1990
Argued/Submitted:12/17/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/22/1993

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLandon G. Dowdey N
Mona M. LyonsNY
AppelleeD.C. Redevelopment Land AgencyN
Robert R. Veith YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DOWDEY, LANDON G. D.C. REDEVELOPMENT LAND AGENCY
01/01/1902
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 5/10/90 ORD: SUA SPONTE, NOTE - 01 CNSOLIDATING 90-361 & 90-514; NOTE - 02 APLT IN 90-514 TO FILE DR/SRT, NOTE - 02 AND $50 FEE W/IN 10 DAYS OR NOTE - 03 THAT CASE WILL BE DISMISSED; NOTE - 03 BRF OF APLT-X-APLE, D.C. NOTE - 04 REDEVEL LAND AGENCY, DUE W/IN NOTE - 04 40 DAYS FROM DATE COMPLETE NOTE - 05 RECORDS ARE FILED IN THIS NOTE - 05 COURT. NOTE - 06 CON 90-361 NOTE - 06
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/12/17 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - VIETHR FOR - DC RLA ATTY 2 - YOUNGM FOR - DOWDEY
03/30/1990FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/16/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/10/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-05 CWC PANELRO SCDATE 040990 SCHPRD DR
05/14/1990DESIGNATION OF RECORD AJ PANEL SCDATE 052190 SCHPRD DR
05/14/1990$50.00 DOCKETING FEE AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/14/1990STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/19/1990RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 052190 SCHPRD R
06/19/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(EXHIBITS TWO LARGE BLACK LOOSE LEAF BINDERS) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/17/1990FiledRecord Completed
07/17/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 072790 SCHPRD CHECK
07/17/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(35 PGS/JANIFER) AD PANEL SCDATE 071990 SCHPRD RT
08/23/1990APPELLEE/CROSS-APPELLANT'S BRIEF (REDEVELOPMENT LAND AGENCY) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/24/1990FiledBriefing Completed
09/24/1990APPELLANT/CROSS-APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 092890 SCHPRD BAE
10/15/1990APPELLEE-CROSS-APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF (DC REDEVELOPMENT LAND AGENCY) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/02/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF (APLE-X-APLT) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/02/1990RECEIVED APLE-X-APLT REPLY BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/15/1990ORDER GRANT APLE-X-APLT MO TO FL LODGED REPLY BRIEF. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 110790 SCHPRD VS
11/15/1990REPLY BRIEF APLE-X-APLT MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/17/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/17/1990ARGUED PANELTESTWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/30/1992AFFIRMED IN PART/REVERSED IN PART Judgment AF in part & RV in part judgment on appeal & RM cause to trial court w/instructions as set forth in opinion filed (TE ST WG)
01/22/1993ORD GRT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL PET FOR REH/REH EB within 14 days from the date of this order. (RO)
02/05/1993APLE'S PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC (appellee/cross-appellant)
02/16/1993ORDER that appellant/cross-appellee within 20 days from the date of this order shall file a response to petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc (10 copies). (RO)
09/14/1993ORD DENY APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REH/REH EN BANC (of appellant in no. 90-CV-361 and appellee in this appeal). (EB)
09/22/1993MANDATE ISSUED