judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA V. WILLIAM C. SUYDAM

Case Information: 90-CV-0517
Short Caption:DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA V. WILLIAM C. SUYDAMClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LT35050-89Filed Date:04/25/1990

Opening Event Date:04/25/1990Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/02/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/11/1990
Argued/Submitted:02/14/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/14/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDistrict of ColumbiaN
Donna M. MuraskyYY
Charles L. Reischel YN
AppelleeWilliam C. Suydam N
Sarah E. Rosenson YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA SUYDAM, WILLIAM C. ET AL
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/02/14 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - MURASKYD FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - ROSENSONS FOR - APPELLEES
04/24/1990DESIGNATION OF RECORD & SRT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/24/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/25/1990FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/03/1990APPELLEE'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/02/1990FiledRecord Completed
07/02/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/13/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 081390 SCHPRD BA
08/28/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 091790 SCHPRD BE
09/05/1990ORDER GRANTG APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 10/15/90; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 082990 SCHPRD V
10/11/1990FiledBriefing Completed
10/11/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 101590 SCHPRD BE
02/14/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/14/1991ARGUED PANELBEFAWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/24/1991REVERSED AND REMANDED JUDGMENT RV JUDGMENT ON APPEAL /CAUSE RM FOR FURTHER PRCDGS PANELBEFAWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/24/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - RVRM METH -OPN JUDGE -FA CITE 591 A.2d 856
05/24/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - FA PAGE # - 1411
06/14/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD