judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALEX PETERKIN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-1040
Short Caption:ALEX PETERKIN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3224-84Filed Date:09/01/1987

Opening Event Date:09/01/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/22/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/25/1988
Argued/Submitted:02/27/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/21/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAlex Peterkin N
Warren GormanYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Sharon M. Collins YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PETERKIN, ALEX UNITED STATES
09/01/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WARREN E. GORMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/16/1987RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 110287 SCHPRD R
10/29/1987LETTER LTR REFER TO COUNSEL OF APLT 10/21/87 LTR. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/30/1987ORDER APLT DOCKETING STATE DUE W/IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 101387 SCHPRD DSA
11/02/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(41 PGS. -- ARTIS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 101987 SCHPRD RT
11/05/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 110987 SCHPRD DSA
04/22/1988FiledRecord Completed
04/22/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (15 PGS - WATKINS) JB PANEL SCDATE 061588 SCHPRD RT
04/25/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/19/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 060688 SCHPRD BA
06/15/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 21ST (NO OPPO) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 062488 SCHPRD BE
07/22/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/23/88 GT PB PANEL SCDATE 072188 SCHPRD BE
08/19/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/25/1988FiledBriefing Completed
08/25/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/27/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELBESCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1989SUBMITTED PANELBESCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/21/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD