judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHERYL L. BOSFIELD V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-1028
Short Caption:CHERYL L. BOSFIELD V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8115-86Filed Date:08/26/1987

Opening Event Date:08/26/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/12/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/22/1988
Argued/Submitted:12/09/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/30/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCheryl L. Bosfield N
Melvin M. Dildine YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Su Zann Lamb YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BOSFIELD, CHERYL L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1904JUDGE - SW AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
08/26/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/28/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 101387 SCHPRD DSA
09/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MELVIN M. DILDINE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/16/1987RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 102687 SCHPRD R
10/26/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (PLEADINGS, ETC) MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1988FiledRecord Completed
02/12/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (149 PGS TR - TOOBY) GT PANEL SCDATE 013188 SCHPRD RT
02/16/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/23/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 4TH (NO OPPO) JB (PB) PANEL SCDATE 032888 SCHPRD BA
04/22/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 050488 SCHPRD BA
05/18/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 23, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 052688 SCHPRD BE
06/22/1988FiledBriefing Completed
06/22/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 062388 SCHPRD BE
12/09/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/09/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELNWBEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988SUBMITTED PANELNWBEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/30/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD