judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JIMMY J. VAUGHN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-1098
Short Caption:JIMMY J. VAUGHN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3720-83Filed Date:09/23/1987

Opening Event Date:09/23/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/28/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/24/1988
Argued/Submitted:10/17/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/08/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJimmy J. Vaughn N
G. Godwin Oyewole YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Oliver W. McDanielYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901VAUGHN, JIMMY J. UNITED STATES
09/23/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/06/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) G. GODWIN OYEWOLE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/28/1987FiledRecord Completed
10/28/1987RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 112387 SCHPRD R
10/30/1987ORDER APLT DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE W/IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 101687 SCHPRD DSA
11/05/1987LETTER LETTER TO COUNSEL REFERRING APLT'S 10/30/87 LETTER. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/12/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS RJG PANEL SCDATE 110987 SCHPRD DSA
11/12/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/08/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/08/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE DSA, CLK TO FILE LDGD DSA; FO: APLT BR DUE IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 120387 SCHPRD EBP
01/19/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 011888 SCHPRD BA
02/16/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 17TH MLH (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 021888 SCHPRD BE
03/16/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 24, 1988 (N O OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 031788 SCHPRD BE
03/21/1988ORDER GRT APLE'S MO FOR EXT OF TM TO FILE BRF TO 3/24/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/24/1988FiledBriefing Completed
03/24/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 032488 SCHPRD BE
09/16/1988RECEIVED IN 87-993 APLT'S STATEMENT PURSUANT TO MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/17/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/17/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING THE JUDGMENT ON APPEAL SL PANELPYNWSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/17/1988SUBMITTED SL PANELPYNWSC SCDATE 101788 SCHPRD CSUM
10/17/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
11/08/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD