judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RUBY L. RIVERS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-1089
Short Caption:RUBY L. RIVERS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1331-86Filed Date:09/17/1987

Opening Event Date:09/17/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/08/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/02/1989
Argued/Submitted:01/09/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/06/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRuby L. Rivers N
Edward C. Sussman YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Ann K. H. SimonYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901RIVERS, RUBY L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 031089 ORDER : COUNSEL FOR NOTE - 01 APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE BRIEF NOTE - 02 OR OTSC WHY APPOINTMENT SHLD NOTE - 02 NOT BE VACATED & NAME REMOVED NOTE - 03 FROM PANEL OF ATTNYS TO RE- NOTE - 03 CEIVE APPOINTMENTS IN PROCEED- NOTE - 04 INGS COVERED BY CJA. NOTE - 04
09/17/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/06/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) EDWARD C. SUSSMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/29/1987RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 111687 SCHPRD R
10/30/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 110987 SCHPRD DSA
10/30/1987ORDER APLT DOCKETING STATE DUE W/IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 101687 SCHPRD DSA
02/05/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (92 PGS TR - MAJORS) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/08/1988FiledRecord Completed
02/08/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (589 PGS TR - KACZOROWSKI) GT PANEL SCDATE 013088 SCHPRD RT
02/09/1989ORDER COUNSEL TO FILE BA W/IN 20 DAY OR FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSC FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/10/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 04. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 111587 SCHPRD RT
03/21/1989APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO OTSC & REQUEST FOR EXT. OF TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 14 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 032089 SCHPRD BA
04/19/1989ORDER THAT THE BRF OF APLT SHALL BE FILED W/I 10 DAYS FROM DATE OF THIS ORDER SL PANELRBH SCDATE 040789 SCHPRD N
05/02/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD (NO OPPO) PANEL SCDATE 050189 SCHPRD BA
05/02/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/08/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/08/1989ORDER GRANT MO TO FL APLT BRF; APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 050389 SCHPRD M
06/21/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8-7-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 060889 SCHPRD BE
07/06/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO EXTENT BRF DUE BY 8/3/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 070389 SCHPRD CHECK
08/02/1989FiledBriefing Completed
08/02/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 080389 SCHPRD BE
01/09/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/09/1990SUBMITTED PANELFEBERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/16/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFEBERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/16/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/06/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD