judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FENTON D. JOHNSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-1102
Short Caption:FENTON D. JOHNSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Lead: 87-CM-0896 Consolidated:87-CF-1102, 87-CM-0897 , 87-CM-0898 , 87-CM-1103
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M4543-87Filed Date:07/21/1987

Opening Event Date:07/21/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/18/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/17/1990
Argued/Submitted:10/17/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/15/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantFenton D. Johnson N
Ann Sungmie Suh NN
AppellantFenton D. Johnson N
Alfred J. Merlie NN
AppellantFenton D. Johnson N
Deborah A. PersicoYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Sherri L. Evans YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JOHNSON, FENTON D. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 11/17/87 ORD: ss, 87-1102 & NOTE - 01 87-1103 ARE CONS W/ 87-896, NOTE - 02 -897, & -898; CON BRF OF APLT NOTE - 02 DUE40 DAYS AFTER COM REC IS FL NOTE - 03 CON 87-896,-897,-898 & 87-1103 NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 031088 ORDER: HOLD MO FOR STAY NOTE - 04 IN ABEYANCE; FO: CR CARTER IN NOTE - 05 10 DAYS TO FILE EST COMP DATE NOTE - 05 OF RT. NOTE - 06 040389 ORD: GRANT CRT-APTD NOTE - 06 COUNSEL MO TO W/DRAW TO THE NOTE - 07 EXTENT THAT THE APPTMENT OF NOTE - 07 ANN S. SUH, ESQ., IS VACATED NOTE - 08 & ALFRED J. MERLIE, ESQ. IS NOTE - 08 APPTD TO REPRESENT APLT ON NOTE - 09 APPEAL; FORMER COUNSEL TO NOTE - 09 TRANSMIT ALL PAPERS INCLUDING NOTE - 10 RT TO NEW COUNSEL; APLT BRF NOTE - 10 DUE IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 11 9/12/89 ORD:GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 11 FOR APLT TO W/D & VACATE APPMT NOTE - 12 OF ALFRED MERLIE & APPT DEBOR- NOTE - 12 AH PERSICO FOR APLT; ALFRED NOTE - 13 MERLIE TO TRANSMIT TO NEW NOTE - 13 COUNSEL ALL PAPERS NECESSARY NOTE - 14 FOR APPEAL; NEWLY APPTD COUNSL NOTE - 14 TO FL STATE IN 20 AS TO STATUS NOTE - 15 OF PENDG RT. NOTE - 15 NOTE - 16 05/17/90 ORD: GRT APLE MO X TM NOTE - 16 TO FL LODGED BRF; APPEAL SHALL NOTE - 17 BE SCHEDULED FOR CONSIDERATION NOTE - 17 BEFORE A MERITS DIV. AS SOON NOTE - 18 AS THE CALENDAR PERMITS. NOTE - 18
01/01/1906 SUHA VACATED BY THE 3/29/89 ORDER MERLIEA VACATED 9/12/89
07/21/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/28/1987RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL NUNC PRO TUNC TO 8/31/87 (ANN SUMGMIE SUH, ESQ.) (SEE 87-896 FOR VOUCHER) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 AND 02. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/29/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (17 PGS - CARTER) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/21/1988RECEIVED COPY OF APPELLANT'S REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (12 PGS TR - OLIVER) GREG PANEL SCDATE 113087 SCHPRD RT
01/29/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/02/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY BRIEFING SCHEDULE JB PANEL SCDATE 031088 SCHPRD BA
03/10/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04 - 05. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 021588 SCHPRD OPE
03/14/1988RECEIVED CERTIFICATION OF 5/20/87 RT FROM CT RPTR CARTER. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1988RECEIVED CERTIFICATION OF 10/19/87 RT FROM CT RPTR CARTER. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (18 PGS - BOSTON) JB PANEL SCDATE 040188 SCHPRD RT
04/05/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO STAY PEND DIS OF 23-110 MO IN TR CT; COUNSEL TO FILE MO W/IN 20 DAYS. EBP PANEL SCDATE 041488 SCHPRD CHECK
04/25/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO ESTABLISH A BRIEFING SCHEDULE RJG PANEL SCDATE 042588 SCHPRD STATE
05/19/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO ESTABLISH BRF SCHD; BRF OF APLT DUE 40 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORD. PB PANELPY SCDATE 050988 SCHPRD OPE
06/14/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) JB PANEL SCDATE 062888 SCHPRD BA
06/22/1988LETTER ANDERS LTR TO APLT; RESPONSE DUE BY 7/22/88. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 062488 SCHPRD CHECK
04/03/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ALFRED J. MERLIE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/03/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 06-10 ACG PANELROST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/03/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE AD PANEL SCDATE 051589 SCHPRD BA
05/11/1989ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT, ON OR BEF 6/1/89, TO FILE STMT RE ARRANGEMENTS FOR TRANSC. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/17/1989STATEMENT TO COURTS ORDER RE TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 060189 SCHPRD STATE
06/12/1989ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING BA UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT DOCKETED. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(12 PGS/WILLIAMS/TAPE) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/05/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF ALFRED J. MERLIE AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DEBORAH A. PERSICO, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 11-15. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 091189 SCHPRD CHECK
09/29/1989APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSETO 10-12-89 TO STATUS OF PENDING TRANSCRIPT AD NO OPPO PANEL SCDATE 100289 SCHPRD STATE
10/06/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: STATUS OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1989ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING BA TO AND INC. 40 DAYS FR DATE 6/15/89 RT FLD AS SUPP REC. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1990FiledRecord Completed
01/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (11-PGS/WILLIAMS) AJ PANEL SCDATE 030490 SCHPRD RT
01/22/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 030590 SCHPRD BA
03/06/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(15 PGS/WILLIAMS) AD SE 87--897 FOR RT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/05/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 3, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 040590 SCHPRD BE
04/27/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/3/90; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 042090 SCHPRD V
05/03/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 10, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 050390 SCHPRD BE
05/07/1990APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR EXT. OF TIME TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 051590 SCHPRD OPA
05/11/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF (MXBE STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/17/1990FiledBriefing Completed
05/17/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/17/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 16 THRU 18. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 051190 SCHPRD B
10/17/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/17/1990SUBMITTED PANELNWFEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/25/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELNWFEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/25/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
11/15/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD