judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TYRONE W. JOHNSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-1086
Short Caption:TYRONE W. JOHNSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2446-86Filed Date:09/16/1987

Opening Event Date:09/16/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/13/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/28/1991
Argued/Submitted:05/14/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/10/1993

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTyrone W. Johnson N
Greta C. Van Susteren YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JOHNSON, TYRONE W. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 11/16/87 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO. NOTE - 01 FOR LV TO FILE DR & CLK DIRTD NOTE - 02 TO FILE LODGED DR. FO THAT NOTE - 02 APLT IN 10 DAYS SHALL FILE THE NOTE - 03 DKTG STMT OR THIS CASE SHALL NOTE - 03 STAND DISMISSED. NOTE - 04 10/18/88 ORD: DENY APLT'S MO. NOTE - 04 TO STAY APPEAL W/O PREJUDICE NOTE - 05 TO RENEWAL AT THE TIME THE MO. NOTE - 05 PURSUANT TO DC CODE SEC 23-110 NOTE - 06 (1981) IS FILED IN THE TRIAL NOTE - 06 COURT, PROVIDED A COPY OF THAT NOTE - 07 MOTION IS APPENDED TO THE NOTE - 07 RENEWED MOTION FOR STAY. NOTE - 08 3/21/89 ORD: GRT APLT'S THIRD NOTE - 08 REQUEST FOR STAY AND ALL PROC. NOTE - 09 IN THIS APPEAL ARE HEREBY NOTE - 09 STAYED PDG DISP. OF THE MO. TO NOTE - 10 VACATE SENTENCE FILED IN THE NOTE - 10 TRIAL CT. FO THAT CNSL FOR NOTE - 11 APLT W/I 30 DAYS SHALL ADVISE NOTE - 11 THIS CT. RE THE STATUS OF THE NOTE - 12 MO. TO VACATE SENTENCE PDG IN NOTE - 12 TRIAL CT. FAILURE OF CNSL TO NOTE - 13 NOTIFY THIS CT W/I 5 DAYS NOTE - 13 AFTER RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF NOTE - 14 DIPS. OF THE MO PDG IN TRIAL NOTE - 14 CT WILL BE CONSIDERED NON- NOTE - 15 COMPLIANCE WITH THE GENERAL NOTE - 15 RULES OF THIS CT AND MAY NOTE - 16 RESULT IN CNSL'S NAME BEING NOTE - 16 REMOVED FROM THE PANEL OF NOTE - 17 ATTYS TO RECEIVE APPTMTS IN NOTE - 17 PROC. COVERED BY CJA. NOTE - 18 5/10/89 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 18 FOR CLARIFICATION & REMOVE NOTE - 19 CASE FROM REG CAL OF 6/29/89; NOTE - 19 COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FL STATUS NOTE - 20 REPORT IN 30 DAYS ON THE NOTE - 20 STATUS OF THE 23-110 MO IN THE NOTE - 21 TRIAL COURT. NOTE - 21 NOTE - 22 CON 90-1078 NOTE - 22 NOTE - 23 10/24/90 ORD: GRANTG APLT'S MO NOTE - 23 TO APPOINTED COUNS IN NO. NOTE - 24 90-1078 & THOMAS R. KENNEDY, NOTE - 24 ESQ.,IS APPOINTD TO REPRESENT NOTE - 25 APLT IN NO. 90-1078; F/O APLT NOTE - 25 MO FOR LV TO PROCEED ON APPEAL NOTE - 26 IFP IS GRANTD; F/O COUNS FOR NOTE - 26 APLT IN NO. 90-1078 TO FL DSA NOTE - 27 W/IN 10 DAYS & BRF OF APLT IN NOTE - 27 NO. 90-1078 TO BE FILED W/IN NOTE - 28 40 DAYS. NOTE - 28
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/05/14 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - TROSMANE FOR - APPELLEE ATTY 2 - KLEIND FOR - APPELLEE TRDATE- 91/05/14 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - ARMSTRONGM FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - KENNEDYT FOR - APPELLANT
01/01/1906 ARMSTRONGM WILL ARGUE THIS CASE
09/16/1987NOTICE OF APPEAL in 87-CF-1086.
10/02/1987$50.00 DOCKETING FEE PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DR & SRT MLH PANEL SCDATE 092887 SCHPRD DR
10/05/1987RECEIVED DR & SRT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/09/1987$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/26/1987RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/16/1987DESIGNATION OF RECORD SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/16/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 3 SL PANELPY SCDATE 092887 SCHPRD DSA
11/17/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(DR & ORDER OF JUDGE PRYOR DATED 11/16/87) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/19/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 112787 SCHPRD DSA
01/13/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (1-745 PIRFO) PB PANEL SCDATE 123187 SCHPRD RT
01/13/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (746-1140 -- PIRFO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1988RECORD COMPLETED
08/22/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/09/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY JB PANEL SCDATE 100388 SCHPRD BA
10/18/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 4 THRU 7 SL PANELPY SCDATE 092988 SCHPRD N
10/24/1988ORDER APLT'S BRIEF SHALL BE FILED W/I 40 DAYS SL PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/25/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 120588 SCHPRD BA
10/25/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY APPEAL PENDING 23-110 MOTION IN SUPERIOR COURT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/09/1988ORDER DENY APLT'S SECOND REQUEST FOR STAY SL PANELRO SCDATE 102688 SCHPRD Q
11/23/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (20 PGS RT - BURNS) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12/29/88 (NO OPA) GT PB PANEL SCDATE 112988 SCHPRD BE
12/28/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1/27/89 (NO OPA) MLR PANEL SCDATE 122988 SCHPRD BE
01/18/1989ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 1/27/89 ANY FUR REQ FOR EXT WILL BE DISFAVORED. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 010989 SCHPRD CHECK
01/27/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 2ND (NO OPPO) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 012789 SCHPRD BE
02/03/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/10/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 020689 SCHPRD CHECK
02/21/1989RECEIVED MOTION OF APPELLANT, PRO SE, TO STAY PROCEEDINGS MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1989RECEIVED LETTER DATED 2/15/89, FROM AP- PELLANT, PRO SE MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/03/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/21/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 8 THRU 17 SL PANELRO SCDATE 031589 SCHPRD OPE
03/23/1989APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO 3-21-89 ORDER AD PANEL SCDATE 042089 SCHPRD CHECK
03/28/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5(ORDER/JUDGE WEISBERG) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/04/1989MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR CLARIFICATION JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/10/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 18-21. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 051689 SCHPRD OPE
05/31/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING 23-110 MOTION FILED IN THE TRIAL COURT JB PANEL SCDATE 061289 SCHPRD STATE
07/24/1989ORDER APLT W/I 30 DAYS SHALL ADVISE THIS CT RE STATUS OF 23-110 MO FILED IN THE TRIAL COURT SL PANELRO SCDATE 071089 SCHPRD N
07/27/1989APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER DATED 7/24/89 RE: 23-110 MOTION PENDING IN LOWER COURT GT PANEL SCDATE 082389 SCHPRD ANSA
10/30/1989ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT W/IN 10 DAYS SHALL ADVISE THIS CT RE STATUS OF 23-110 MOTION JB PANELRBH SCDATE 100189 SCHPRD CHECK
11/03/1989STATEMENT OF APLT RE 23-110 MO AD PANEL SCDATE 110989 SCHPRD STATE
12/08/1989ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT, ON OR BEF 1/7/90, TO FILE STMT RE STATUS OF 23-110 MOT. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/18/1989APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER RJG PANEL SCDATE 010790 SCHPRD STATE
03/05/1990ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT, W/IN 30 DAYS TO FILE STMT RE STATUS OF 23-110 MOTION. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/12/1990STATEMENT RE 23-110 MOTION AJ PANEL SCDATE 040590 SCHPRD STATE
05/24/1990ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT SHALL ADVISE W/IN 30 DAYS RE STATUS OF THE PENDING 23-110 MO. GW PANELRO SCDATE 050990 SCHPRD V
06/01/1990STATEMENT OF APLT IN RESPONSE TO 5-24-90 ORDER AD PANEL SCDATE 062590 SCHPRD CHECK
06/20/1990MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APLT TO VACATE STAY OF APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1990ORDER DENY MO OF APLT TO VACATE STAY & COUNSEL FOR APLT TO ADVISE CRT IN 30 OF STATUS OF 23-110 PANELRO SCDATE 070990 SCHPRD TO
08/07/1990STATEMENT TO STATUS 23-110 MOTION (APLT) AJ PANEL SCDATE 081790 SCHPRD CHECK
09/06/1990ORDER SS, CONS 87-1086 & 90-1078; APLT TO FL DSA IN 90-1078 IN 10 DAYS. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 090190 SCHPRD CHECK
09/25/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/25/1990RECEIVED IN 90-1078 APLT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT (PRO SE) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IN 90-1078 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/24/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 23 THRU 28. GW PANELRO SCDATE 101790 SCHPRD V
11/05/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 110590 SCHPRD DSA
12/03/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 90-1078 TO 1-2-91 AD PANEL SCDATE 120490 SCHPRD BA
01/02/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 90-1078 UNTIL AFTER COMPLE- TION OF INEFFECTIVE ASSISTANCE PER D.C. 23-110 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1991RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 90-1078 (MXBA STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/15/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 90-1078 AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN NO. 90-1078 JJ PANEL SCDATE 012891 SCHPRD OPE
01/29/1991ORDER GRT APLT MOTS IN NO. 90-1078 X TM TO FL LODGED BRF, BRF FL & APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 011591 SCHPRD B
02/28/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF IN 90-1078 AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/26/1991APPEARANCE OF MARY L. ARMSTRONG, ESQ. FOR APLT. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/14/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/14/1991ARGUED PANELTEWGMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/10/1991MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT TO DELAY DECISION ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/15/1991APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO APLT'S MOTION TO DELAY DECISION ON APLT'S APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 102291 SCHPRD OPE
06/29/1992APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY (pro-se) INSTANT PROCEEDINGS UNTIL AFTER THE LOWER COURT
07/14/1992AFFIRMED IN PART/REMANDED IN PART Judgment AF the judgment on the merits & RM cause w/directions (TE WG MK)
07/24/1992APLT MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EB to August 30, 1992.
07/24/1992MOTION(S) FEE PAID for maxrr.
07/31/1992ORD GRT APLT MO TO EXT TIME TO FILE PET FOR REH EB on or before August 30, 1992. (RO)
08/25/1992ORDER Appellant's pro se request for stay is denied as moot. (By Te, Wa, Mk)
08/27/1992APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC
09/08/1992ORDER directing appellee within 20 days from the date of this order to file a response to petition for rehearing en banc (10 copies). (RO)
09/23/1992APPELLEE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION to aplt's petition for review
09/30/1992ORD GRT APLE MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION to petition for rehearing en banc on or before October 28, 1992. (RO)
10/28/1992APPELLEE'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to exceed page limit
10/28/1992RECEIVED opposition to petition for rehearing en banc
11/24/1992APPELLEE'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for leave to file corrected copy of opposition to petition for rehearing en banc.
11/24/1992RECEIVED corrected copy of opposition to petition for rehearing en banc.
12/08/1992CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28
04/29/1993ORDER DENYING APLT PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC and granting aple's motion to file opposition in excess of page limit, the motion to file corrected copy of opposition, and the Clerk is directed to file the lodged corrected copy of the opposition to the petition. (EB) (Judge Farrell is recused from this case and Judges Rogers, Ferren, Terry, and Wagner voted to grant rehearing en banc.)
05/10/1993MANDATE ISSUED