judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

COURTNEY A. THOMPSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-1080
Short Caption:COURTNEY A. THOMPSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead:87-CF-1080Consolidated: 87-CT-1081
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4909-86Filed Date:09/14/1987

Opening Event Date:09/14/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/16/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/20/1988
Argued/Submitted:01/18/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/11/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCourtney A. Thompson N
Steven R. KiershYY
AppellantUnited StatesN
William M. Blier YN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901THOMPSON, COURTNEY A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON 87-1081 NOTE - 01
09/14/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEVEN R. KIERSH, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/22/1987RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 111387 SCHPRD R
11/09/1987ORDER SS, CONS 87-1080 & 87-1081, FO: THAT DOCKETING STATEMENTS DUE W/IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 101387 SCHPRD DSA
11/18/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 111987 SCHPRD DSA
12/11/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (77 PGS. FRANKLIN) PANEL SCDATE 110487 SCHPRD RT
03/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (164 PGS. HART) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/16/1988FiledRecord Completed
03/16/1988ORDER APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 122887 SCHPRD RT
04/15/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 042588 SCHPRD BA
05/18/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/20/88 (NO OPA) GT PB PANEL SCDATE 052088 SCHPRD BE
06/16/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 20TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 062088 SCHPRD BE
07/15/1988ORDER GRANT APLE MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR ONLY TO THE EXTENT THAT THE BR IS DUE 30 DAYS AFT RT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 062188 SCHPRD M
07/20/1988FiledBriefing Completed
07/20/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/29/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (101 PGS MITCHELL) AD PANEL SCDATE 083188 SCHPRD RT
01/18/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/18/1989SUBMITTED PANELMKFEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/21/1989AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELFESTMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/21/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -ST CITE 567 A.2d 907
12/21/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - ST PAGE # - 3194
01/11/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD