judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES UNDERWOOD, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-1024
Short Caption:JAMES UNDERWOOD, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F9904-86Filed Date:08/24/1987

Opening Event Date:08/24/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/02/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/13/1988
Argued/Submitted:03/02/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/28/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames Underwood, Jr.N
Calvin Steinmetz YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Ann K. H. SimonYN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901UNDERWOOD JR., JAMES UNITED STATES
08/24/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) CALVIN STEINMETZ, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/01/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 101387 SCHPRD DSA
10/16/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 102387 SCHPRD R
06/02/1988FiledRecord Completed
06/02/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (277 PGS - MILLER) JB PANEL SCDATE 051688 SCHPRD RT
06/03/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/30/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (10 PGS. -- MITCHELL) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/12/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 27TH JB PANEL SCDATE 071388 SCHPRD BA
07/27/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF (MXBA STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/15/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/15/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF; CLK TO FL LDG BRF; APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. PB PANELPY SCDATE 072588 SCHPRD OPE
09/13/1988FiledBriefing Completed
09/13/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 091488 SCHPRD BE
03/02/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/02/1989SUBMITTED PANELMKBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/03/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELMKBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/03/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/28/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD