judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTHONY NEAL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-1087
Short Caption:ANTHONY NEAL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2436-86Filed Date:09/16/1987

Opening Event Date:09/16/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/22/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/15/1989
Argued/Submitted:07/11/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/16/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnthony Neal N
Thomas G. Ross NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Kit Adelman-Pierson YN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901NEAL, ANTHONY UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 7/27/89 ORD: SS, PDS IS REQ TO NOTE - 01 ENTER APPRNC AS AMICUS CURIAE NOTE - 02 ON BEHALF OF APLT FOR PURPOSE NOTE - 02 OF ADVISING THE CRT GENERALLY NOTE - 03 ON THE TRL CRT'S AUTHORITY NOTE - 03 UNDER D.C. CODE 33-541 (e) NOTE - 04 (1981); PARTIES & AMICUS IN 30 NOTE - 04 DAYS FL MEMORANDA ADDRESSING NOTE - 05 (1) WHETHER THE TRL CRT ORD NOTE - 05 OF 8/21/87 DENYING EXPUNGEMENT NOTE - 06 & ENTERING AN ADJUDICATION OF NOTE - 06 GUILT BUT IMPOSING NO SENTENCE NOTE - 07 IS A FINAL ORD OR OTHERWISE AN NOTE - 07 APPEALABLE ORD, (2) WHETHER NOTE - 08 THE TRL CRT HAS JURISDICTION NOTE - 08 UNDER D.C. CODE 33-541 (e) NOTE - 09 (1981) TO ENTER AN ADJUDICATN NOTE - 09 OF GUILT AFTER PLACING DEFEND NOTE - 10 ON PROBATION W/OUT VERDICT; NOTE - 10 MEMORANDA SHALL INCLUDE INTER NOTE - 11 ALIA, REFERENCES TO LEGISLATIV NOTE - 11 HISTORY AS WELL AS ANNOTATIONS NOTE - 12 & CITATIONS TO CASES CONSTRU- NOTE - 12 ING COMPARABLE STATUTES.
01/01/1904JUDGE - FA AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/07/11 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - ROSST FOR - APPELLANT
09/16/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/06/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS G. ROSS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/22/1987FiledRecord Completed
10/22/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 111687 SCHPRD R
10/30/1987ORDER APLT DOCKETING STATE DUE W/IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 101687 SCHPRD DSA
11/13/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 110987 SCHPRD DSA
02/03/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (33 PGS - MOORE) JB PANEL SCDATE 031588 SCHPRD RT
04/13/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (6 PGS. -- PIRFO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 022988 SCHPRD RT
08/05/1988ORDER APLT BR DUE IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 030188 SCHPRD RT
08/10/1988RECEIVED CERTIFICATION OF 8/17/87 RT FROM CT RPTR MOORE. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/09/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 14TH JB PB PANEL SCDATE 081488 SCHPRD BA
10/17/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11/14/88 GT PANEL SCDATE 101488 SCHPRD BA
11/04/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 11/14/88; NFX. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 110288 SCHPRD V
11/17/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 25, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 111488 SCHPRD BA
11/30/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF LATE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/29/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/29/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL BRF & CLK TO FL BA; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 112988 SCHPRD OPE
02/03/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3-2-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 013089 SCHPRD BE
02/13/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 3/2/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 021389 SCHPRD CHECK
03/02/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(ORDER) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/03/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF TIME HAVING EXPIRED JB PANEL SCDATE 030289 SCHPRD BE
03/03/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/15/1989FiledBriefing Completed
03/15/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/15/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE FOR LV & BRF OF APLE IS FL; SCHED CASE AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 031589 SCHPRD OPA
07/11/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/11/1989ARGUED PANELRGNWST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/11/1989MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 7/11/89 CITATION OF APLE TO DIVISION. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/11/1989CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28 (APPELLEE) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/27/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-12. DAS PANELRONWST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/28/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF AMICUS CURIAE FOR EXTEN. OF TIME TO FILED MEMO ORDERED BY COURT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/28/1989APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM TO COURT'S ORDER FILED 7/27/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/29/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO EXTEND TO SEPTEMBER 6TH TO FILE MEMO TO 7/27 ORD JB PANEL SCDATE 082889 SCHPRD MEMO
08/31/1989MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 8/28/89 SUPP BRF OF APLE TO DIVISION. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/07/1989AMICUS CURIAE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/08/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE COURT-ORDERED MEMORAN- DUM TO SEPTEMBER 12TH JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/11/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF AMICUS & CLK TO FL MEMO OF AMICUS. DAS PANELRONWST SCDATE 091189 SCHPRD OPE
09/11/1989AMICUS CURIAE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1989MEMORANDUM OF APLT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/15/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL SUPP MEMO & CLK TO FL MEMO. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 091989 SCHPRD OPE
09/15/1989APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/12/1990REVERSED AND REMANDED JUDGMENT RV TRIAL COURT ORDER/ CAUSE RM w/INSTRUCTIONS PANELRGNWST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/12/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - RVRM METH -OPN JUDGE -NW CITE 571 A.2d 222
03/12/1990OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - NW PAGE # - 0628 OPINION TYPE D JUDGE - ST PAGE # - 0000
03/26/1990PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1990ORDER THAT APLT AND AMICUS CURIAE W/I 20 DAYS TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PET FOR REH/REH EB SL PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/03/1990AMICUS CURIAE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE IN OPPO TO PETITION FOR REHEARING OR REHEARING EN BANC AD PANEL SCDATE 050790 SCHPRD ANSC
05/07/1990APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE AD PANEL SCDATE 050790 SCHPRD ANSA
07/16/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD