judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LAWRENCE M. WALKER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-1061
Short Caption:LAWRENCE M. WALKER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2561-86Filed Date:09/08/1987

Opening Event Date:09/08/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/11/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/25/1988
Argued/Submitted:11/08/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/04/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLawrence M. Walker N
Thomas K. Clancy YN
AppellantLawrence M. Walker N
William H. Edmisten YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Sharon M. Collins YN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WALKER, LAWRENCE M. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 10/28/88 ORD: GRANTG MO OF NOTE - 01 THOMAS CLANCY, ESQ., TO W/DRAW NOTE - 02 ; APPOINTING WILLIAM EDMISTEN, NOTE - 02 ESQ., TO REPRESENT APLT HEREIN NOTE - 03 ; FORMER COUNSEL TO TRANSMIT NOTE - 03 ALL RECORDS TO NEW COUNSEL NOTE - 04 FORTHWITH; CASE TO REMAIN NOTE - 04 SCHED ON 11/8/88 REG CAL.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/11/08 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - EDMISTENW FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - COLLINSS FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 CLANCYT VACATED 10/28/88
09/08/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS K. CLANCY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/06/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 101387 SCHPRD DSA
10/19/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 110987 SCHPRD R
10/19/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (PLEADINGS, ETC) MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/11/1987FiledRecord Completed
12/11/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/11/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (271 PGS - RONAN) JB PANEL SCDATE 113087 SCHPRD RT
12/18/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 012088 SCHPRD BA
01/22/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 24, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 012288 SCHPRD BE
02/22/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/25/88 PB PANEL SCDATE 022488 SCHPRD BE
03/21/1988ORDER GRT APLE'S MO FOR EXT OF TM TO FILE BRF TO 3/25/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 031088 SCHPRD N
03/25/1988FiledBriefing Completed
03/25/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 032588 SCHPRD BE
10/21/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF (THOMAS K. CLANCY) AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/28/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WILLIAM H. EDMISTEN, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/28/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1-4 CWC PANELPY SCDATE 103188 SCHPRD CHECK
11/08/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/08/1988ARGUED PANELNWFEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/13/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELNWFEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/13/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/04/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD