judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DELORES Y. KENNEDY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-1078
Short Caption:DELORES Y. KENNEDY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F994-87Filed Date:09/16/1987

Opening Event Date:09/16/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/28/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/21/1988
Argued/Submitted:01/18/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/14/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDelores Y. Kennedy N
James C. Savage YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Bruce Delaplaine YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901KENNEDY, DELORES Y. UNITED STATES
09/16/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JAMES C. SAVAGE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 101387 SCHPRD DSA
10/22/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 111687 SCHPRD R
12/28/1987FiledRecord Completed
12/28/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (161 PGS - KACZOROWSKI) JB PANEL SCDATE 113087 SCHPRD RT
12/29/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/04/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER RECEIPT OF TRANSCRIPT (NO OPPO) PB (COPY OF MO FOR RT IN TR CT.) PANEL SCDATE 020888 SCHPRD BA
01/20/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER RT HAS BEEN FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 010688 SCHPRD EBP
03/01/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 ( 14 PGS. -- BREMEN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 033188 SCHPRD RT
04/11/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/25/88 (NO OPPO) GT (PB) PANEL SCDATE 041188 SCHPRD BA
04/25/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 042588 SCHPRD BA
05/23/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/27/88 (NO OPA) MLH PB PANEL SCDATE 052588 SCHPRD BE
06/21/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7/21/88 GT PANEL SCDATE 062788 SCHPRD BE
07/13/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 7/21/88-NFX. PB PANELPY SCDATE 071188 SCHPRD V
07/21/1988FiledBriefing Completed
07/21/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 072188 SCHPRD BE
01/18/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/18/1989SUBMITTED PANELMKFEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/23/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELMKFEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/23/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/14/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD