judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAVID A. BROWN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-1074
Short Caption:DAVID A. BROWN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6526-87Filed Date:09/14/1987

Opening Event Date:09/14/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/19/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDavid A. Brown N
Samuel Ed Wilhite YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BROWN, DAVID A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 12/21/88 ORD: DENY APLT'S MO NOTE - 01 TO WITHDRAW APPEAL W/O PREJ. NOTE - 02 TO RENEWAL PROVIDED APLT W/I NOTE - 02 10 DAYS FILE A STMT IN ACCORD. NOTE - 03 WITH JOHNSON V. U.S., NOTE - 03 513 A.2D 798 (DC 1986).
09/14/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ED WILHITE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/16/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (12 PGS. -- FINNERIN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 111387 SCHPRD R
10/30/1987ORDER APLT DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE W/IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 101387 SCHPRD DSA
11/09/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1988ORDER CLK OF SUP CT TO TRANSMIT RT OF 9/2/87 PROC. AS SUP REC F/W APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 100987 SCHPRD RT
07/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (7 PGS RT-WATKINS) MLH PANEL SCDATE 071588 SCHPRD RT
08/17/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/26/88 MLH PANEL SCDATE 081688 SCHPRD BA
08/29/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 8 ADDITIONAL DAYS JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/06/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR AN ADDITIONAL 7 DAYS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 7 DAYS TO SEPTEMBER 19TH JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/19/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/26/88 GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/18/1988ORDER APLT W/I 10 DAYS TO ADVISE CT. AS TO WHETHER HE INTENDS TO DISMISS THIS APPEAL SL PANELPY SCDATE 100788 SCHPRD N
10/28/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL MLR PANEL SCDATE 102888 SCHPRD ANSA
12/21/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 3 SL PANELRO SCDATE 111688 SCHPRD N
01/30/1989ORDER SS, BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS DAS PANELRO SCDATE 011889 SCHPRD Q
03/20/1989ORDER DIRG APLT, ON OR BEF 3/30/89 TO FL BA OR SHOW CAUSE WHY APT SHOULD NOT BE VACATED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/27/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 033089 SCHPRD BA
05/01/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 1, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 050189 SCHPRD BE
05/05/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 6/1/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 051189 SCHPRD CHECK
05/30/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-12-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 060189 SCHPRD BE
06/22/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 7/1/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 061289 SCHPRD OPA
07/03/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO REMAND FOR RESENTENCING RJG PANEL SCDATE 070189 SCHPRD BE
08/29/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
08/29/1989ORDER GRANTING MO TO REMAND TO SUP CT FOR RESENTENCING. MEH PANELMKTESC SCDATE 082489 SCHPRD VS
08/29/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - RM METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE
09/19/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD