judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KENNETH N. MULDROW V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-1048
Short Caption:KENNETH N. MULDROW V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8952-84Filed Date:09/10/1987

Opening Event Date:09/10/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/01/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/22/1988
Argued/Submitted:12/14/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/09/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKenneth N. Muldrow N
Stephen D. ScavuzzoYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Ann K. H. SimonYN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MULDROW, KENNETH N. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 12/1/87 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 01 FOR FORMA PAUPERIS & APPT NOTE - 02 STEPHEN SCAVUZZO TO REPRESENT NOTE - 02 APLT; CLK TO FL LODGED RECORD; NOTE - 03 BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 03
09/10/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/14/1987LETTER REQUESTING APLT TO FILE FORM 5 AFFIDAVIT & REQUEST TO APPT. COUNSEL GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/22/1987RECEIVED RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 110987 SCHPRD R
10/23/1987MEMORANDUM RE-MAIL LETTER DATED 10/14/87 (FORM 5 & REQUEST APPOINTMENT FOR COUNSEL) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/09/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1987FiledRecord Completed
12/01/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEPHEN D. SCAVUZZO, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 111387 SCHPRD CHECK
12/01/1987RECORD ON APPEAL DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/07/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 12, 1988 RJG (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 011188 SCHPRD BA
02/22/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 11TH JB PANEL SCDATE 021288 SCHPRD BA
03/10/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 3/11/88; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 030888 SCHPRD X
03/31/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPTS ARE FILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 041188 SCHPRD BA
03/31/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE BR OR VACATE APPOINTMENT & REFER TO BPR. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 031188 SCHPRD BA
04/14/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (29 PGS - PIRFO) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/18/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/27/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/27/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR, CLK TO FILE LDGD APLT BR & APLE BR DUE W/IN 30 DAYS.EBP PANELPY SCDATE 041888 SCHPRD M
05/17/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 16, 1988 RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 052788 SCHPRD BE
06/14/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/22/1988FiledBriefing Completed
06/22/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/14/1988SUBMITTED PANELMKBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/16/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JDGMT HEREIN APPEALED PANELMKBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/16/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/09/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD