judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LEON BLAKENEY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-1090
Short Caption:LEON BLAKENEY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5812-80Filed Date:09/03/1987

Opening Event Date:09/03/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/01/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLeon Blakeney N
James W. KleinNY
Sharon D. Styles-AndersonYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BLAKENEY, LEON UNITED STATES
09/03/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/28/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1987ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/15/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 101587 SCHPRD DSA
10/26/1987RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 110287 SCHPRD R
11/10/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1( 55 PGS. -- SIMMS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/04/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 5, 1987 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 120787 SCHPRD BA
01/11/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OUT OF TIME (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 010588 SCHPRD BA
01/11/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/20/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/20/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL BRF & CLK TO FL BA; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 011988 SCHPRD X
02/23/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 25, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 022288 SCHPRD BE
03/23/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 25, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 032588 SCHPRD BE
03/28/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 4/25/88 - NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 032488 SCHPRD V
04/25/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 5, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 042588 SCHPRD BE
04/28/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 5/5/88-ANFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/03/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/09/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
05/09/1988ORDER APPEAL DISMISSED. PB PANELPY SCDATE 050488 SCHPRD V
05/09/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PY CITE
06/01/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD