Case: 03-10-00722-CR
03-10-00722-CR
10/29/2010
Attempted Murder
Brad William Reinke
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/24/2011 | Letter brief filed | Appellant | |
05/11/2011 | Reply brief filed | State | |
04/21/2011 | Letter brief filed | Appellant | |
03/21/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State | |
02/17/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/19/2012 | Mandate issued | | |||||
06/20/2012 | Opinion issued | | |||||
09/06/2011 | Petition for discretionary review filed | | |||||
09/02/2011 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |||||
09/02/2011 | Motion to expedite disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
08/29/2011 | Motion to expedite filed | | |||||
08/22/2011 | Petition for discretionary review filed | | |||||
07/22/2011 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded |
| ||||
05/24/2011 | Letter brief filed | | |||||
05/11/2011 | Reply brief filed | | |||||
04/27/2011 | Submitted | | |||||
04/21/2011 | Letter brief filed | | |||||
04/20/2011 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
04/12/2011 | Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument | | |||||
04/11/2011 | Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument | | |||||
04/06/2011 | Set for submission on oral argument | | |||||
03/21/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||
02/17/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||||
01/19/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
01/18/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
01/07/2011 | Document returned | | |||||
12/27/2010 | Telephone call received | | |||||
12/22/2010 | Telephone inquiry to or from the court | | |||||
12/17/2010 | Reporters record filed | | |||||
12/06/2010 | Motion for extension received | | |||||
11/05/2010 | Reporters record filed | | |||||
11/02/2010 | Clerks record filed | | |||||
10/29/2010 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/19/2012 | Case Stored | Case stored |
07/19/2037 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | The Honorable Rosemary Lehmberg Mr. Blake Williams |
Reinke, Brad William | Criminal - Appellant | Ms. Alexandra M. Gauthier |
Trial Court Information
167th District Court
Travis
Honorable Michael Lynch
105359