Case: 01-92-00168-CR
01-92-00168-CR
02/14/1992
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Mayfield, Leonard B.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/12/1993 | Mandate issued | | |
05/14/1993 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |
04/29/1993 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
04/29/1993 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
04/22/1993 | Submitted | | |
04/22/1993 | Submission | | |
04/22/1993 | Submitted | | |
03/29/1993 | Submission | | |
02/25/1993 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
02/25/1993 | Case ready to be set | | |
02/25/1993 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
02/25/1993 | Case ready to be set | | |
02/16/1993 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
01/21/1993 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
01/14/1993 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06) | |
01/07/1993 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
12/21/1992 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
12/01/1992 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
11/05/1992 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
10/27/1992 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
10/01/1992 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
09/21/1992 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
08/26/1992 | Motion to extend time to file state of facts disp | Grant motion | |
08/26/1992 | Statement of facts filed | | |
08/21/1992 | Motion to extend time to file statement of facts | | |
08/10/1992 | Brief due for retained counsel | | |
06/04/1992 | Motion to extend time to file state of facts disp | Grant motion | |
06/04/1992 | Motion to substitute counsel | Grant motion | |
05/22/1992 | Motion to extend time to file statement of facts | | |
05/22/1992 | Motion to substitute counsel | | |
04/09/1992 | Transcript filed | | |
02/14/1992 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
02/13/1992 | Date of Sentence in Criminal Case | | |
02/13/1992 | Notice of appeal filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/12/1993 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State | Criminal - Appellant | Mark A. Goldberg |
State | Criminal - State of Texas | Julie Klibert |
State | Criminal - Appellant | Bill Meyer |
State | Criminal - State of Texas | John B. Holmes |
Trial Court Information
262nd District Court
Harris
Honorable JOHN HENRY JAMES
607,053
13 yrs tdc