Case: 14-08-00128-CV
14-08-00128-CV
02/15/2008
Unknown Civil Case Type.
Cecil Gammill, Jr. and Jaime Martinez
David A. Fettner, Trustee of The Gammill Family Trust, ET AL
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/08/2016 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |||
07/11/2008 | Case stored | | |||
07/11/2008 | Mandate issued | | |||
07/10/2008 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||
06/16/2008 | Petition for review due in Supreme Court | | |||
05/16/2008 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||
05/01/2008 | Memorandum opinion issued | DISMISSED |
| ||
05/01/2008 | Motion to consolidate disposed | DENIED AS MOOT | | ||
04/30/2008 | Submitted | | |||
04/30/2008 | Case ready to be set | | |||
04/14/2008 | Response due | | |||
04/03/2008 | Letter issued by the court | | |||
03/26/2008 | Motion to consolidate filed | | |||
03/26/2008 | Clerks record due | | |||
03/20/2008 | Docketing statement filed | | |||
03/17/2008 | Docketing statement filed | | |||
03/13/2008 | Docketing statement due | | |||
03/12/2008 | Letter filed | | |||
03/12/2008 | Mediation docketing statement due | | |||
03/11/2008 | No clerks record filed in civil case | | |||
02/29/2008 | Letter filed | | |||
02/27/2008 | Court reporters information sheet sent | | |||
02/27/2008 | Letter issued by the court | | |||
02/27/2008 | Letter issued by the court | | |||
02/27/2008 | Court fee due | | |||
02/18/2008 | Reporters record due | | |||
02/18/2008 | Record due | | |||
02/15/2008 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||
02/13/2008 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||
02/12/2008 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||
10/19/2007 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/08/2016 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Cecil Gammill, Jr and Jaime Martine | Appellant | R Michael Northrup |
David A. Fettner, Trustee of The Gammill Family Trust & John Gammill | Appellee | James Eugene Thompson Jason B. Ostrom |
Trial Court Information
190th District Court
Harris
Honorable Jennifer Elrod Walker
2004-55686