Case: WR-21,753-02
WR-21,753-02
12/27/1991
1107-HC
HAYNES, TOMMY NEAL
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/17/1992 | ACTION TAKEN | HC relief denied WITHOUT written order. | |
05/06/1992 | SUPP RECD | | |
01/29/1992 | ORDER ISSUED | HC Remanded to trial court for evidentiary hearing | |
01/22/1992 | WRIT RECEIVED | | |
12/27/1991 | WRIT RECEIVED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/17/1992 | STORED | WRIT STORED |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Haynes, Tommy Neal | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) |
Court of Appeals Information:
13th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
28th District Court
Nueces
88-CR-1359-A (2)