judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

VACCARO VS. SHENDAL

Case Information: 38116
Short Caption:VACCARO VS. SHENDALCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D135826Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/09/2001 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/02/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Brent D. Percival, Esq., P.C.--check no. 2691.
07/02/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-11169
07/09/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/30/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-12830
08/01/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed July 30, 2001. The clerk shall file the docketing statement received on July 30, 2001. 01-12991
08/01/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-12831
08/02/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Lester H. Berkson.
11/01/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 28, 2001. 01-18324
12/04/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 16, 2002. 01-20274
01/22/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 02-01436
01/28/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 02-01844
05/15/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, appellant has not responded to our order of January 28, 2002 or otherwise communicated with this court. Cause appearing, " . . . we dismiss this appeal as abandoned." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-08486
06/11/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-08560
06/11/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/22/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 17, 2002. 02-08560