judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL J. SINDRAM V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-0859
Short Caption:MICHAEL J. SINDRAM V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM971-09Filed Date:07/01/2010

Opening Event Date:07/01/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/10/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael J. Sindram Y
Warren GormanNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/01/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/29/2010ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS nos. 09-CM-1029 and 10-CO-859 for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Warren Gorman, Esquire, is appointed to represent appellant in appeal no. 10-CO-859. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, in appeal no. 10-CO-859, counsel for appellatn shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript avaiable for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary have been rodered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
08/13/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (10CO859) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
08/16/2010RECORD INDEX (10CO859)
08/16/2010RECORD COPIES (10CO859)
08/16/2010APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to sever appeal
08/23/2010 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why APPEAL NO. 10CO859 should not be dismissed for LACK OF STANDING and how he is aggrieved by the order which discharged the probation show cause against him. In Re: C.T., 724 A.2d 590 (DC 1999). It is *****MORE*****
08/23/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's MOTION TO SEVER IS HEREBY HELD IN ABEYANCE. (BY: ETW) lw
08/23/2010TMC - OTSC - motion to sever appeals (IN ABEYANCE) - ROTSC
09/02/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - dated 8/23/10 (10CO85)
09/03/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (5pgs/Tape) 5/4/10 proc.
09/03/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (13pgs/Tape) 5/18/10 proc.
09/03/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (13pgs/Tape) 5/24/10 proc.
09/03/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (11pgs/Tape) 6/29/10 proc. w/CD include
10/20/2010 ORDERED that appeal no. 10CO859 IS HEREBY DISMISSED for LACK OF STANDING. See In re Estate of Delaney, 819 A.2d 968, 1003 (DC 2003);...It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION TO SEVER APPEAL NOS 09CM1029 and 10CO859 IS DENIED AS MOOT. It is *****MORE*****
10/20/2010DISMISSED
11/10/2010MANDATE ISSUED in 10-CO-859.
04/18/2014FiledArchived