judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF JAMES T. FROST, Deceased: FROST CONSTRUCTION COMPANY v. SHELLEY M. DODSON, Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of James T. Frost, Deceased

Case Heading (06-169)
Case Number:06-169Case Docketed On:07/19/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Big Horn CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Wills, Decedents' Estates and Probate Code (Title 2)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF JAMES T. FROST, Deceased: FROST CONSTRUCTION COMPANY v. SHELLEY M. DODSON, Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of James T. Frost, Deceased
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF JAMES T. FROST, Deceased: FROST CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, Appellant (Petitioner), v. SHELLEY M. DODSON, Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of James T. Frost, Deceased, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantFrost Construction CompanyT. Thomas Singer
AppelleeShelley M. DodsonMarc Cooper Thompson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 63
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/19/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/19/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/19/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/19/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/05/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/26/2006Event - Phone Call from Marc Thompson re brief of appellee. Advised him that we did not have his name (or Mr. Copenhaver's) nor Estate as an appellee to this proceeding. Suggested that maybe the caption may need to be amended. Will confer with co-counselEventPhone CallFinal
10/16/2006Brief - Appellee; received copy of desigantion of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
10/16/2006Notice-Incoming - Request to place on expedited docketNotice-IncomingRequest to place on brief only docketFinal
11/01/2006Brief - Appellant reply, brief is untimely, one day lateBriefAppellant replyFinal
11/01/2006Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
11/01/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/06/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, Volume I, Original PapersRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/22/2006Order - Assignment of judge, Judge Waldrip and recusing Justice HillOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
04/13/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order, reversing and remanding, District Judge Waldrip writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/01/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/01/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/01/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal