judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

QUON VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 38113
Short Caption:QUON VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36006
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A403739Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/02/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Hardy & Woodman, Ltd.--check no. 1589.
07/02/2001Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 01-11164
07/02/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion to File Privileged Document under Seal for in Camera Review. 01-11165
07/16/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Directing Answer and Granting Motion to file Document Under Seal. The real parties in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. Petitioner shall have 30 days from the date of this order to submit the document for filing, and upon receipt, the court clerk shall file the document under seal. 01-12041
08/09/2001Other Other. Filed Submission of Privileged Document under Seal for In Camera Review. (Filed under Seal.) 01-13501
08/17/2001Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Answer of Real Parties in Interest to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 01-13992
08/17/2001Other Other. Filed Real Parties in Interests' Exhibits filed in Support of the Answer of Real Parties in Interest to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 01-13993
12/27/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral Argument will not be scheduled and this matter shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the papers filed herein. 01-21788
03/07/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-04119
04/02/2002RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 02-04183
04/02/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.