Case: 05-07-00061-CR
05-07-00061-CR
01/17/2007
Other Felony
Jackson, Shawn Lee
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/31/2008 | Mandate issued | | |
05/07/2008 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed | |
06/01/2007 | Brief Due | | |
05/02/2007 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
04/30/2007 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
04/25/2007 | Letter Filed | | |
04/20/2007 | Court Reporter Record Due | | |
03/21/2007 | Extension on Reporter's Record Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/19/2007 | Extension on Reporter's Record | | |
02/07/2007 | 25.2 Certification filed | | |
02/02/2007 | Motion Extend Time to File Notice of Appeal Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/29/2007 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
01/28/2007 | Record due | | |
01/22/2007 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |
01/22/2007 | No 25.2 certificate | | |
01/17/2007 | Motion Extend Time to File Notice of Appeal | | |
01/17/2007 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
01/17/2007 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
01/12/2007 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
11/29/2006 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/31/2008 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Angela Coker | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Angela Coker |
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | John R. Roach |
Shawn Lee Jackson | Criminal - Appellant | Stephanie Michelle Duecker |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 4
Collin
Honorable Raymond G. Wheless
004-87663-05
90 Dys Cnty Jail