Case: 06-09-00032-CV
06-09-00032-CV
03/23/2009
Summary judgment
Hubert Owens and Linnie Owens, d/b/a Owens Bail Bonds
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/15/2017 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |||||
06/17/2009 | Mandate issued | | |||||
04/15/2009 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||
04/15/2009 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
04/14/2009 | Submitted | | |||||
04/09/2009 | Motion to dismiss filed | | |||||
03/23/2009 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/17/2009 | Case Stored | Case stored |
09/15/2017 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State of Texas | Appellee | Danny Buck Davidson |
Hubert Owens and Linnie Owens d/b/a Owens Bail Bonds | Appellant | David E. Moore |
Trial Court Information
123rd District Court
Panola
Honorable Guy W. Griffin
1997-C-073